Jason Flowers - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrow Raiders | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 09 Feb 2003 | 18 May 2003 |
Batley Bulldogs | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 21 Apr 2003 | 20 Jul 2003 |
Bradford Bulls | 18 | 5 | 0 | 0 | 20 | 31 Mar 1996 | 13 Jun 2004 |
Castleford Tigers | 4 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 12 May 2002 | 27 Jun 2004 |
Dewsbury Rams | 2 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 01 Jun 2003 | 17 Aug 2003 |
Doncaster | 2 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 25 May 2003 | 10 Aug 2003 |
Featherstone Rovers | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 04 May 2003 | 27 Jul 2003 |
France | 2 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 12 | 11 Nov 1998 | 03 Jul 2001 |
Gateshead Thunder | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 18 Apr 1999 | 11 Jul 1999 |
Halifax Panthers | 14 | 5 | 0 | 0 | 20 | 09 Apr 1996 | 08 Jul 2001 |
Huddersfield Giants | 9 | 2 | 0 | 1 | 9 | 14 Jun 1998 | 22 Jul 2001 |
Hull FC | 11 | 4 | 0 | 0 | 16 | 10 May 1998 | 25 Jul 2004 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 28 Feb 2003 | 07 Sep 2003 |
Hunter Mariners | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 13 Jun 1997 | 20 Jul 1997 |
Ireland | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 18 Nov 1998 | 18 Nov 1998 |
Leeds Rhinos | 19 | 4 | 0 | 0 | 16 | 05 Apr 1996 | 28 May 2004 |
Leigh Leopards | 7 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 16 Feb 2003 | 05 Oct 2003 |
London Broncos | 15 | 5 | 0 | 0 | 20 | 19 May 1996 | 29 Feb 2004 |
Newcastle Thunder | 1 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 23 Mar 2003 | 23 Mar 2003 |
Oldham | 7 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 20 Apr 1996 | 03 Aug 2003 |
Paris Saint-Germain | 4 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 07 Jun 1996 | 05 Jul 1997 |
Perth Reds | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 08 Jun 1997 | 27 Jul 1997 |
Racing Club Saint-Gaudens XIII | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 10 Feb 2002 | 10 Feb 2002 |
Rochdale Hornets | 4 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 23 Feb 2003 | 24 Aug 2003 |
Salford Red Devils | 11 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 12 | 16 Mar 1997 | 08 Sep 2002 |
Sheffield Eagles | 9 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 03 May 1996 | 07 Aug 1999 |
St. Helens | 19 | 4 | 0 | 0 | 16 | 04 Feb 1996 | 16 Mar 2003 |
Swinton Lions | 2 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 12 | 19 Jan 2003 | 02 Apr 2003 |
Toulouse Olympique | 1 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 26 Jan 2003 | 26 Jan 2003 |
Wakefield Trinity | 10 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 07 Mar 1999 | 20 Jun 2004 |
Warrington Wolves | 16 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 31 May 1996 | 01 Sep 2002 |
Whitehaven | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 18 Apr 2003 | 18 Apr 2003 |
Widnes Vikings | 5 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 07 Apr 2002 | 18 Jul 2004 |
Wigan Warriors | 13 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 14 Apr 1996 | 04 Jul 2002 |
Workington Town | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 12 May 1996 | 24 Feb 2002 |
York Knights | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 26 Feb 1999 | 26 Feb 1999 |