Steve Blakeley - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adelaide Rams | 2 | 0 | 6 | 0 | 12 | 08 Jun 1997 | 03 Aug 1997 |
Barrow Raiders | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 18 May 2003 | 18 May 2003 |
Batley Bulldogs | 4 | 2 | 22 | 0 | 52 | 29 Nov 1995 | 20 Jul 2003 |
Bradford Bulls | 12 | 2 | 15 | 0 | 38 | 01 Jan 1995 | 29 Apr 2002 |
Castleford Tigers | 11 | 1 | 14 | 0 | 32 | 09 Oct 1994 | 22 Sep 2002 |
Dewsbury Rams | 6 | 4 | 24 | 0 | 64 | 05 Nov 1995 | 17 Aug 2003 |
Doncaster | 3 | 1 | 13 | 1 | 31 | 19 Feb 1995 | 10 Aug 2003 |
Featherstone Rovers | 8 | 0 | 21 | 0 | 42 | 11 Sep 1994 | 27 Jul 2003 |
France | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 12 Jun 1996 | 23 Oct 1999 |
Gateshead Thunder | 1 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 25 Apr 1999 | 25 Apr 1999 |
Halifax Panthers | 13 | 2 | 33 | 0 | 74 | 06 Apr 1997 | 08 Sep 2002 |
Huddersfield Giants | 11 | 4 | 37 | 0 | 90 | 17 Sep 1995 | 12 Aug 2001 |
Hull FC | 14 | 7 | 51 | 1 | 131 | 28 Aug 1994 | 25 Aug 2002 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 2 | 1 | 5 | 0 | 14 | 01 Sep 1996 | 13 Jul 2003 |
Hunslet | 3 | 2 | 11 | 0 | 30 | 12 Feb 1995 | 13 Feb 2000 |
Keighley Cougars | 5 | 2 | 23 | 1 | 55 | 20 Sep 1995 | 08 Sep 1996 |
Leeds Rhinos | 11 | 4 | 21 | 0 | 58 | 12 Nov 1995 | 26 Jul 2002 |
Leigh Leopards | 7 | 0 | 17 | 1 | 35 | 11 Feb 2001 | 05 Oct 2003 |
London Broncos | 13 | 6 | 33 | 1 | 91 | 04 Dec 1994 | 11 Aug 2002 |
Newcastle Thunder | 2 | 2 | 27 | 0 | 62 | 19 Mar 2003 | 23 Mar 2003 |
North Queensland Cowboys | 2 | 0 | 5 | 0 | 10 | 21 Jun 1997 | 27 Jul 1997 |
Oldham | 7 | 2 | 21 | 0 | 50 | 26 Dec 1994 | 03 Aug 2003 |
Ovenden | 1 | 0 | 9 | 0 | 18 | 14 Feb 1998 | 14 Feb 1998 |
Paris Saint-Germain | 3 | 2 | 17 | 1 | 43 | 31 Mar 1997 | 07 Sep 1997 |
Rochdale Hornets | 7 | 2 | 32 | 0 | 72 | 24 Sep 1995 | 24 Aug 2003 |
Sheffield Eagles | 8 | 1 | 25 | 1 | 55 | 08 Jan 1995 | 15 Aug 1999 |
St. Helens | 15 | 4 | 43 | 1 | 103 | 04 Sep 1994 | 16 Mar 2003 |
Swinton Lions | 2 | 1 | 12 | 0 | 28 | 19 Jan 2003 | 02 Apr 2003 |
Wakefield Trinity | 15 | 6 | 36 | 0 | 96 | 21 Aug 1994 | 17 Aug 2002 |
Wales | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 26 Jun 1996 | 26 Jun 1996 |
Warrington Wolves | 12 | 0 | 42 | 0 | 84 | 17 Dec 1994 | 13 Sep 2002 |
Whitehaven | 4 | 2 | 18 | 0 | 44 | 14 Nov 1995 | 29 Jun 2003 |
Widnes Vikings | 8 | 4 | 30 | 0 | 76 | 31 Aug 1994 | 01 Sep 2002 |
Wigan Warriors | 11 | 3 | 16 | 0 | 44 | 11 Feb 1996 | 04 Aug 2002 |
Workington Town | 2 | 0 | 5 | 0 | 10 | 22 Jan 1995 | 09 Apr 1995 |
York Knights | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 27 Feb 2000 | 27 Feb 2000 |