David Mycoe - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Australia | 1 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 26 Oct 1994 | 26 Oct 1994 |
Barrow Raiders | 8 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 16 May 1999 | 12 Sep 2004 |
Batley Bulldogs | 13 | 0 | 6 | 0 | 12 | 07 Mar 1999 | 09 Oct 2005 |
Bradford Bulls | 7 | 1 | 5 | 1 | 15 | 23 Aug 1994 | 16 Aug 1997 |
Bramley | 2 | 1 | 7 | 0 | 18 | 02 Apr 1999 | 08 Aug 1999 |
BRK | 1 | 0 | 3 | 0 | 6 | 01 Feb 1998 | 01 Feb 1998 |
Castleford Tigers | 5 | 1 | 5 | 0 | 14 | 11 Sep 1994 | 06 Apr 1997 |
Chorley/Blackpool | 7 | 1 | 11 | 0 | 26 | 07 May 2000 | 04 Sep 2005 |
Dewsbury Rams | 5 | 1 | 3 | 0 | 10 | 30 Aug 1998 | 29 Apr 2002 |
Doncaster | 10 | 0 | 10 | 1 | 21 | 26 Dec 1994 | 06 Mar 2005 |
Featherstone Rovers | 12 | 1 | 8 | 1 | 21 | 17 Apr 1995 | 21 Mar 2004 |
France under-21s | 3 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 12 | 20 Jan 1990 | 20 Mar 1992 |
Halifax Panthers | 6 | 1 | 12 | 0 | 28 | 30 Oct 1994 | 23 May 1997 |
Huddersfield Giants | 2 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 28 Jan 1996 | 29 May 2002 |
Hull FC | 1 | 0 | 5 | 0 | 10 | 09 Oct 1994 | 09 Oct 1994 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 8 | 0 | 2 | 0 | 4 | 29 Mar 1998 | 31 Aug 2003 |
Hunslet | 8 | 1 | 2 | 0 | 8 | 26 Jul 1998 | 10 Jul 2005 |
Hunter Mariners | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 20 Jun 1997 | 20 Jun 1997 |
Keighley Cougars | 8 | 2 | 8 | 0 | 24 | 18 Dec 1994 | 14 Aug 2005 |
Leeds Rhinos | 7 | 0 | 10 | 0 | 20 | 16 Oct 1994 | 10 Mar 2000 |
Leigh Leopards | 11 | 0 | 3 | 0 | 6 | 04 Dec 1994 | 24 Aug 2003 |
Leigh Miners | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 27 Jan 2001 | 27 Jan 2001 |
Limoux Grizzlies | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 11 Oct 1998 | 17 Oct 1998 |
London Broncos | 5 | 0 | 2 | 0 | 4 | 17 Dec 1995 | 14 Sep 1997 |
London Skolars | 4 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 01 May 2004 | 21 Aug 2005 |
Newcastle Thunder | 5 | 3 | 3 | 0 | 18 | 25 Feb 2001 | 03 Jul 2005 |
Oldham | 12 | 1 | 3 | 0 | 10 | 19 May 1996 | 27 Jul 2003 |
Papua New Guinea | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 30 Oct 1991 | 30 Oct 1991 |
Paris Saint-Germain | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 17 May 1997 | 17 May 1997 |
Rochdale Hornets | 7 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 05 Apr 1998 | 10 Aug 2003 |
Salford Red Devils | 4 | 0 | 7 | 0 | 14 | 08 Jan 1995 | 17 Aug 2003 |
Sheffield Eagles | 11 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 20 Feb 2000 | 05 Aug 2005 |
St. Helens | 4 | 0 | 1 | 0 | 2 | 25 Sep 1994 | 14 Feb 1999 |
Stanley Rangers | 1 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 30 Jan 2000 | 30 Jan 2000 |
Swinton Lions | 9 | 0 | 3 | 0 | 6 | 22 Mar 1998 | 11 Sep 2005 |
Townville | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 31 Jan 1999 | 31 Jan 1999 |
Villeneuve Leopards | 3 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 03 Oct 1998 | 27 Feb 2000 |
Wakefield Trinity | 1 | 0 | 3 | 0 | 6 | 26 Mar 1995 | 26 Mar 1995 |
Warrington Wolves | 6 | 0 | 6 | 0 | 12 | 18 Sep 1994 | 15 Feb 1998 |
Wath Brow Hornets | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 12 Mar 2005 | 12 Mar 2005 |
Whitehaven | 7 | 1 | 3 | 0 | 10 | 15 Mar 1998 | 07 Sep 2003 |
Widnes Vikings | 6 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 02 Oct 1994 | 07 Apr 2001 |
Wigan Warriors | 8 | 1 | 13 | 0 | 30 | 28 Aug 1994 | 21 Sep 1997 |
Workington Town | 12 | 2 | 14 | 0 | 36 | 04 Sep 1994 | 02 Oct 2005 |
York Knights | 8 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 05 Apr 1999 | 24 Apr 2005 |