Daniel Divet - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Australia | 4 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 27 Jun 1990 | 04 Dec 1994 |
Bradford Bulls | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 05 Jan 1994 | 04 Apr 1994 |
Castleford Tigers | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 12 Sep 1993 | 16 Jan 1994 |
England | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 15 Feb 1995 | 15 Feb 1995 |
Featherstone Rovers | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 17 Apr 1994 | 17 Apr 1994 |
Great Britain | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 18 Mar 1990 | 20 Mar 1994 |
Great Britain under-21s | 4 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 08 Mar 1987 | 19 Mar 1988 |
Halifax Panthers | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 05 Sep 1993 | 09 Jan 1994 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 26 Dec 1993 | 01 Apr 1994 |
Leeds Rhinos | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 03 Oct 1993 | 20 Feb 1994 |
Leigh Leopards | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 28 Nov 1993 | 24 Apr 1994 |
New Zealand | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 19 Nov 1989 | 21 Nov 1993 |
Oldham | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 24 Oct 1993 | 24 Oct 1993 |
Papua New Guinea | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 15 Nov 1987 | 24 Nov 1991 |
Russia | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 27 Oct 1991 | 27 Oct 1991 |
Salford Red Devils | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 19 Sep 1993 | 23 Jan 1994 |
Sheffield Eagles | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 31 Oct 1993 | 13 Apr 1994 |
St. Helens | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 03 Dec 1993 | 10 Apr 1994 |
Swinton Lions | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 14 Nov 1993 | 30 Jan 1994 |
Wakefield Trinity | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 07 Nov 1993 | 27 Mar 1994 |
Wales | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 04 Mar 1994 | 05 Mar 1995 |
Warrington Wolves | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 26 Sep 1993 | 06 Feb 1994 |
Widnes Vikings | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 10 Oct 1993 | 06 Mar 1994 |
Wigan Warriors | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 29 Aug 1993 | 23 Mar 1994 |